WA HB2287 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an advisory board to the office of the corrections ombuds.
Title
Creating an advisory board to the office of the corrections ombuds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services. |
2024-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-29 | House | CSJR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |