WA HB2286 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Effective date 6/30/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Effective date 6/30/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the treasurer to transfer budget stabilization account deposits that are attributable to extraordinary revenue growth in the 2013-2015, 2015-2017, and 2017-2019 fiscal biennia.
Title
Directing the treasurer to transfer budget stabilization account deposits that are attributable to extraordinary revenue growth in the 2013-2015, 2015-2017, and 2017-2019 fiscal biennia.
Sponsors
Rep. Ross Hunter [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Effective date 6/30/2015. |
2015-06-30 | House | Chapter 2, 2015 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2015-06-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2015-06-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-29 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-06-28 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |