WA HB2282 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-6)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Effective date 6/7/2018**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting an open internet in Washington state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting an open internet in Washington state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05HouseEffective date 6/7/2018**.
2018-03-05HouseChapter 5, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-05HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-05HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-05SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-02-27SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-27SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-23SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-22SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-22SenateEENT - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology.
2018-02-09HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-09HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-09House1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-06HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Technology & Economic Development.
2018-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-03HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-01-25HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-25HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-25HouseTED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development
2017-12-13HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback