WA HB2266 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying the nature of the driver training education curriculum developed and maintained by the department of licensing and the office of the superintendent of public instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying the nature of the driver training education curriculum developed and maintained by the department of licensing and the office of the superintendent of public instruction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-20SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-19SenateEDU - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-02SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2018-01-31HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2018-01-31HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-01-26HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-01-18HouseED - Majority; do pass.
2018-01-18HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-11HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Education
2017-12-05HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback