WA HB2261 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning housing authorities.
Title
Concerning housing authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-13 | House | Chapter 42, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-02-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2018-02-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-26 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-16 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2017-12-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |