WA HB2257 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting maintenance of certification from being required for certain health professions.
Title
Prohibiting maintenance of certification from being required for certain health professions.
Sponsors
Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] | Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Rep. Paul Graves [R] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] |
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Chapter 211, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-01-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2018-01-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-26 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-17 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2017-12-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |