WA HB2253 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modernizing the functionality of the state environmental policy act.
Title
Modernizing the functionality of the state environmental policy act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-03-08 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-27 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2012-02-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-02-27 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-02-27 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-02-24 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2012-02-24 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-02-24 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2012-02-24 | ENV - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2012-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-02-21 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-02-15 | First reading, referred to Environment. | |
2012-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2012-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-13 | Floor amendment | |
2012-02-13 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2012-02-09 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2012-02-06 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-02-03 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-02-03 | APPG - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-02-03 | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-02-03 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations & Oversight at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-02-02 | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations & Oversight at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to General Government Appropriations & Oversight. | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2012-01-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-01-27 | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-01-27 | ENVI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-01-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-13 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-10 | First reading, referred to Environment. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6130 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.