WA HB2251 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the disposition of unenforceable legal financial obligations other than restitution imposed by a court or an agent of the court against a juvenile prior to July 1, 2023.
Title
Concerning the disposition of unenforceable legal financial obligations other than restitution imposed by a court or an agent of the court against a juvenile prior to July 1, 2023.
Sponsors
Rep. Julio Cortes [D] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] |
Rep. Mary Fosse [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5974 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.