WA HB2243 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning all-terrain vehicles.
Title
Concerning all-terrain vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Keith Goehner [R] |
Rep. Richard DeBolt [R] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-12-18 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6114 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2243&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2243.pdf |