WA HB2233 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the college in high school program to students in ninth grade.
Title
Expanding the college in high school program to students in ninth grade.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-03 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2019-12-11 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2233&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2233.pdf |