WA HB2230 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Washington state ferries the Washington state marine highway system.
Title
Renaming the Washington state ferries the Washington state marine highway system.
Sponsors
Rep. Edwin Anderson [R] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] |
Rep. Frederick Finn [D] | Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] | Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] | Rep. Norma Smith [R] |
Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-01 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-17 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2230&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2230.pdf |