WA HB2213 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning defects and omissions in the laws that have been identified by the justices of the supreme court or judges of the superior courts pursuant to Article IV, section 25 of the state Constitution.
Title
Concerning defects and omissions in the laws that have been identified by the justices of the supreme court or judges of the superior courts pursuant to Article IV, section 25 of the state Constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-25 | House | Chapter 232, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2024-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-30 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-30 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 116 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 04 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 20 | 380 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 80 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 68 | 060 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 68 | 070 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 68 | 090 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |