WA HB2211 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning vapor products, e-cigarette, and nicotine products tax and regulatory reform to support youth substance prevention.
Title
Concerning vapor products, e-cigarette, and nicotine products tax and regulatory reform to support youth substance prevention.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] |
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-06-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-06-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-06-25 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-06-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:15 PM. |
2015-06-08 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 11:00 AM. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-25 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |