WA HB2195 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Effective date 10/9/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Effective date 10/9/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying certain auditor's fees.
Title
Modifying certain auditor's fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristine Lytton [D] | Rep. Brady Walkinshaw [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] |
Rep. Susan Fagan [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | Effective date 10/9/2015. |
2015-07-06 | House | Chapter 28, 2015 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2015-07-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Held on first reading. |
2015-06-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 73; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-06-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-06-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-15 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-04-07 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2015-04-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-19 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |