WA HB2195 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening the early learning facilities grant and loan program by revising criteria and providing resources to the Ruth LeCocq Kagi early learning facilities development account.
Title
Strengthening the early learning facilities grant and loan program by revising criteria and providing resources to the Ruth LeCocq Kagi early learning facilities development account.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Frank Chopp [D] |
Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Dave Paul [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Rep. David Hackney [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Mary Fosse [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024*. |
2024-03-25 | House | Chapter 230, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | EDU - Majority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2024-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-02 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 31 | 575 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 31 | 577 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 87 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |