WA HB2172 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the use of vacant state agency property by a local government during an emergency.
Title
Providing for the use of vacant state agency property by a local government during an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Housing: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-22 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2024-01-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-18 | House | HOUS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Housing. |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
35a | 38 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |