WA HB2166 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing access to portable orders for life-sustaining treatment.
Title
Increasing access to portable orders for life-sustaining treatment.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Paul [D] | Rep. Clyde Shavers [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2024-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-12 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-26 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 70 | 480 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 122 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |