WA HB2165 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-24 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-24 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the department of natural resources to conduct a forest biomass energy demonstration project.
Title
Authorizing the department of natural resources to conduct a forest biomass energy demonstration project.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-24 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-24 | Chapter 163, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-22 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-19 | President signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-18 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2009-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2009-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-07 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on second reading consent calendar. | |
2009-03-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-27 | NROR - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-25 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-10 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-26 | APPG - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-26 | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-26 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 4:00 PM. | |
2009-02-26 | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2009-02-19 | TEC - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | TEC - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-16 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-11 | First reading, referred to Technology, Energy & Communications. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5979 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.