WA HB2164 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing postsecondary education consumer protections.
Title
Providing postsecondary education consumer protections.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] |
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce: do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce: do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2024-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2024-02-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-19 | House | PEW - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce. |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28b | 85 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 85 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 85 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 85 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |