WA HB2151 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 3/13/2024*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 3/13/2024*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reassigning the accreditation of private cannabis testing laboratories from the department of ecology to the department of agriculture.
Title
Reassigning the accreditation of private cannabis testing laboratories from the department of ecology to the department of agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Effective date 3/13/2024*. |
2024-03-13 | House | Chapter 69, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-01 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | LC - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2024-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-12 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-03 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2024-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-22 | House | RSG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Regulated Substances & Gaming. |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 21a | 736 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 348 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |