WA HB2144 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a deposit return program for qualifying beverage containers to be implemented by a distributor responsibility organization.
Title
Providing for a deposit return program for qualifying beverage containers to be implemented by a distributor responsibility organization.
Sponsors
Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] | Rep. Jamila Taylor [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] |
Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Rep. Chipalo Street [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. April Berg [D] | Rep. Mary Fosse [D] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment & Energy (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-05 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment & Energy. |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-22 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2024-01-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-18 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
35a | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70a | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
70a | 245 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 19 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |