WA HB2124 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-16 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the use of public resources to assist the federal government in any activity that might impede or interfere with revenue to the operating budget pursuant to Washington state's regulation of marijuana and marijuana-related products as prescribed by the laws of the state of Washington.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the use of public resources to assist the federal government in any activity that might impede or interfere with revenue to the operating budget pursuant to Washington state's regulation of marijuana and marijuana-related products as prescribed by the laws of the state of Washington.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-02-17HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback