WA HB2113 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Early Learning & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Early Learning & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a task force on poverty.
Title
Creating a task force on poverty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Human Services. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-20 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |