WA HB2098 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the interest rate for the low-income home rehabilitation revolving loan program.
Title
Modifying the interest rate for the low-income home rehabilitation revolving loan program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2022-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-04 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |