WA HB2079 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Improving school safety by extending and increasing penalties for interference by, or intimidation by threat of, force or violence at schools and athletic activities.
Title
Improving school safety by extending and increasing penalties for interference by, or intimidation by threat of, force or violence at schools and athletic activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Schmidt [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Sam Low [R] | Rep. Leonard Christian [R] |
Rep. Mark Klicker [R] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Stephanie McClintock [R] | Rep. Travis Couture [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2024-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2024-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-30 | House | CSJR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |
2024-01-02 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 635 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 635 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |