WA HB2079 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date 9/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date 9/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the environmental legacy stewardship account.
Title
Concerning the environmental legacy stewardship account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | House | Effective date 9/28/2013. |
2013-07-03 | House | Chapter 28, 2013 Laws 2nd Special Session. |
2013-07-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-06-29 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2013-06-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 7. |
2013-06-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-06-23 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |