WA HB2077 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the placement of human trafficking informational posters in rest areas.
Title
Concerning the placement of human trafficking informational posters in rest areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-07 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |