WA HB2072 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-15 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-15 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning transportation for persons with special transportation needs.
Title
Concerning transportation for persons with special transportation needs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-15 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-15 | Chapter 515, 2009 Laws PV. | |
2009-05-15 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2009-04-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-22 | President signed. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-20 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2009-04-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-10 | Committee amendment adopted as amended. | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-04-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-04-06 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-04-06 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-04-03 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-04-02 | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-04-02 | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-31 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-10 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-06 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-06 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-05 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-27 | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-27 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-09 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |