WA HB2062 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning exemption of certain personnel of the department of social and health services from civil service.
Title
Concerning exemption of certain personnel of the department of social and health services from civil service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 6:00 PM. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2024-02-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-26 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2023-12-29 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |