WA HB2049 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Improving Washington's solid waste management outcomes.
Title
Improving Washington's solid waste management outcomes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-02-20 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-03 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2024-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-18 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2023-12-27 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6005 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-23 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 1:30 PM.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 21b | 110 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21b | 300 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70a | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
70a | 205 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 205 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 205 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 245 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70a | 245 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 245 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 245 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 245 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 245 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 245 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 245 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 245 | 110 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 245 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 77 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
81 | 77 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 77 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 77 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |