WA HB2049 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the higher education performance advisory council.
Title
Creating the higher education performance advisory council.
Sponsors
Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Rep. Susan Fagan [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] |
Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-05 | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2049&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2049.pdf |