WA HB2028 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning legislative technology.
Title
Concerning legislative technology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-23 | House | SEIT - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2017-03-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-15 | House | SEIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-15 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
Same As/Similar To
SB5729 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.