WA HB2026 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning rental income received by people eligible for certain property tax exemption programs.
Title
Concerning rental income received by people eligible for certain property tax exemption programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] |
Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-23 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2023-12-22 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |