WA HB2025 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the development and implementation of a comprehensive plan to improve offender programs.
Title
Requiring the development and implementation of a comprehensive plan to improve offender programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Rep. Eric Pettigrew [D] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] |
Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-18 | House | PS - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Public Safety. |
2018-01-08 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-16 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |