WA HB2022 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the natural disaster economic recovery account to support economic recovery from natural disasters.
Title
Creating the natural disaster economic recovery account to support economic recovery from natural disasters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |