WA HB2020 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of affordable and sustainable housing in the state.
Title
Concerning the creation of affordable and sustainable housing in the state.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-02 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |