WA HB2013 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Paying state retirement benefits until the end of the month in which the retiree or beneficiary dies.
Title
Paying state retirement benefits until the end of the month in which the retiree or beneficiary dies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2023-12-21 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |