WA HB1976 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the incentive structure for tier 1 and tier 2 buildings.
Title
Changing the incentive structure for tier 1 and tier 2 buildings.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Fosse [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] |
Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-14 | House | Chapter 85, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-05 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2024-02-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-22 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-16 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2023-12-19 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |