WA HB1966 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a local infrastructure investment program to support the development of affordable housing, workforce housing, and revitalization efforts.
Title
Creating a local infrastructure investment program to support the development of affordable housing, workforce housing, and revitalization efforts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2022-01-27 | House | HHSV - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | New Code | See Bill Text |