WA HB1957 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a small business disaster recovery financial assistance program.
Title
Establishing a small business disaster recovery financial assistance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Business, Financial Services & Trade (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | BFST - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
2022-02-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-27 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |