WA HB1957 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of park and ride lots by private employer transportation service vehicles.
Title
Concerning the use of park and ride lots by private employer transportation service vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Chambers [R] | Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] | Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] |
Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 9:30 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1957&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1957.pdf |