WA HB1956 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the housing of homeless persons on property owned or controlled by a church.
Title
Authorizing the housing of homeless persons on property owned or controlled by a church.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Rep. Mary Dickerson [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Rep. Geoffrey Simpson [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Rep. Brendan Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-23 | Chapter 175, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-23 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 57; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-20 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-05 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2009-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-03 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-03 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-19 | LGH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-04 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. |