WA HB1952 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the building communities fund program competitive process.
Title
Regarding the building communities fund program competitive process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-10 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-06 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-27 | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-27 | CB - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-24 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Capital Budget. | |
2009-02-12 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-12 | CEDT - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-12 | CEDT - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-12 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Trade at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-11 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-04 | First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development & Trade. |