WA HB1949 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Including in the public safety employees' retirement system specified competency restoration workers at department of social and health services institutional and residential sites that serve civilly committed residents or serve patients under not guilty by reason of insanity findings.
Title
Including in the public safety employees' retirement system specified competency restoration workers at department of social and health services institutional and residential sites that serve civilly committed residents or serve patients under not guilty by reason of insanity findings.
Sponsors
Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Suzanne Schmidt [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Mary Fosse [D] |
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-18 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2023-12-14 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6106 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-29 - Effective date 6/1/2025.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 37 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |