WA HB1945 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Streamlining and enhancing program access for persons eligible for food assistance.
Title
Streamlining and enhancing program access for persons eligible for food assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024*. |
2024-03-25 | House | Chapter 225, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2024-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning. |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning. |
2023-12-14 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 216 | 1368 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 216 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 216 | 578 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |