WA HB1938 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the tourism marketing act.
Title
Enacting the tourism marketing act.
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] |
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2015-02-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-03 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB5916 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.