WA HB1936 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tax incentives for farmers.
Title
Concerning tax incentives for farmers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-01 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2023-12-13 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |