WA HB1936 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the membership and subcommittees of the oversight board for children, youth, and families.
Title
Concerning the membership and subcommittees of the oversight board for children, youth, and families.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Robert Sutherland [R] | Rep. Emily Wicks [D] |
Rep. Eric Robertson [R] | Rep. Rob Chase [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-26 | House | CYF - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families. |