WA HB1932 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Shifting general elections for local governments to even-numbered years to increase voter participation.
Title
Shifting general elections for local governments to even-numbered years to increase voter participation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2024-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2024-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-01-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-12 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-12 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:30 AM. |
2024-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2023-12-12 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29a | 04 | 330 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 17 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 18 | 270 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 23 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 27 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 30 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35a | 02 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |