WA HB1916 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning funding for the early support for infants and toddlers program.
Title
Concerning funding for the early support for infants and toddlers program.
Sponsors
Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Travis Couture [R] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Jamila Taylor [D] |
Rep. Dave Paul [D] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Sen. Bill Ramos [D] | Rep. Julio Cortes [D] |
Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Joe Timmons [D] | Rep. Chipalo Street [D] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] |
Sen. Emily Alvarado [D] | Rep. Greg Nance [D] | Sen. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Mary Fosse [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Clyde Shavers [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-26 | House | Chapter 284, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-26 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-04 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2024-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2024-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-02 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-12 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning. |
2023-12-11 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5933 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-18 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.